Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, L.L.C. v. Southeast Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C.

Plaintiff: Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, L.L.C.
Defendant: Southeast Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03047
Filed: November 19, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
 
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 14, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Denying SEC's 9 Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.12(b)(6), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/14/2013.(rpmcd)
March 5, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/11/2013 at 11:00 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 4, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/5/2013. (rpmcd )
October 22, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own fees and costs in conjunction with this litigation, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/22/2013. (rpmcd )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, L.L.C. v. Southeast Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hospitality Staffing Solutions Group, L.L.C.
Represented By: Robert A. McNiel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southeast Commercial Cleaning, L.L.C.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]