Gallegos v. Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation et al

Counter_defendant: Terrina Gallegos
Cross_defendant: Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation, United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and GEICO General Insurance Co.
Cross_claimant: Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation, United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service and PremierCare Injury Services, LLC
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation, PremierCare Injury Services, LLC and GEICO General Insurance Co.
Plaintiff: Terrina Gallegos
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03106
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:2410 Action affecting property on which US has lien
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. Defendant United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service's Oral Motion to WITHDRAW 36 Motion to Compel Reponses to Discovery and to Shorten Time to Respond is GRANTED. FTR: Courtroom A402 - Courtni Covington. (ccovi)
February 27, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that United States' Motion for Summary Judgment 40 filed by defendant United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service is GRANTED. ORDERED that The Sawaya Law Firm shall deposit a check in the amount of $5 ,000 for the medical payments coverage in the registry of the Court. ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue a check to the IRS in the amount of $5,000. ORDERED that Defendant Rocky Mountain Chiropractic and PremierCare Injury Services [s ic] Motion for Summary Judgment 41 is DENIED. ORDERED that the Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and to Deposit Funds 42 filed by The Sawaya Law Firm is GRANTED in part. Plaintiff is awarded $5,179.57the proceeds remaining from plaintiff's settlement with GEICO in attorney's fees and costs. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 02/27/14.(jhawk, )
February 28, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. ORDERED that the Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs and toDeposit Funds [Docket No. 42] filed by The Sawaya Law Firm is GRANTED in part.Plaintiff TERRINA GALLEGOS is awarded $5,179.57the proceeds remaining fromplaintiff's settlement with GEICOin attorney's fees and costs. ORDERED that defendants shall bear their own costs. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 02/28/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gallegos v. Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter_defendant: Terrina Gallegos
Represented By: Christopher R. Dugan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Meloney Cargil Perry
Represented By: Christopher T. Colby
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Cross_claimant: PremierCare Injury Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Philip Ramos, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service
Represented By: Aaron Michael Bailey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rocky Mountain Chiropractic Corporation
Represented By: Keith Evan Frankl
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PremierCare Injury Services, LLC
Represented By: Joseph Philip Ramos, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO General Insurance Co.
Represented By: Christopher T. Colby
Represented By: Meloney Cargil Perry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrina Gallegos
Represented By: Christopher R. Dugan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]