McReynolds v. Albertsons

Defendant: Albertsons
Plaintiff: Robert R. McReynolds
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03112
Filed: November 28, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Delta
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
January 11, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/11/2013. (skl)
May 14, 2013 36 Featured Case ORDER granting 34 the parties' Joint Motion for the Entry of a Protective Order and entering Joint Protective Order; and denying 33 Motion for Protective Order as superseded by Doc. # 34. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 05/14/2013. (cbslc1)
May 29, 2013 40 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference held on 5/29/2013. In light of the parties agreement, 37 Plaintiffs MOTION to Compel is DENIED as moot. 38 Plaintiffs LETT ER/MOTION is DENIED. The court will allow an additional 30 days for Plaintiff to respond to Defendants discovery and shall be due on or before June 30, 2013. Discovery due by 9/30/2013. The court grants leave for Plaintiff to serve ten more interrogatories in addition to the interrogatories he has yet to serve. Dispositive Motions due by 10/31/2013. FTR: Courtroom A402 - Courtni Covington. (ccovi)
November 29, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/29/2012. (sks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McReynolds v. Albertsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertsons
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert R. McReynolds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]