Veres et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Plaintiff: Robin Veres and David Veres
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03119
Filed: November 29, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:2409(a) Quiet Title Action
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2014 25 Featured Case ORDER Overruling Objection to and Adopting 23 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss and Supporting Memorandum Brief[# 21 ], filed May 24, 2013, is GRANTED. Defendants are AWARDED their costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/21/2014.(klyon, )
March 21, 2014 26 Featured Case Final JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of HSBC Bank USA National Association, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. against David Veres, Robin Veres re: 25 Order by Clerk on 3/21/2014. (klyon, )
December 1, 2012 4 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND ADVISEMENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Scheduling Conference set for 2/25/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/1/12. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4) (kfinn, )
January 9, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER re 5 Motion for TRO and 7 Report and Recommendations. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge # 7 , filed 12/19/2012, is Approved and Adopted as orders of this court. Plaintiff's Ex Parte Notice, Application for Temporary Restraining Order and Order To Show Cause re: Preliminary Injunction # 5 , filed 12/11/2012, is Denied. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/9/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Veres et al v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HSBC Bank USA National Association
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin Veres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Veres
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]