Thornton v. Kramer et al

Defendant: Adamic, O. Christenson and Kramer
Plaintiff: David A. Thornton
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03152
Filed: December 3, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
December 27, 2012 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/2012. (sks)
December 28, 2012 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Status Conference for 1/17/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/28/2012. (ervsl, )
December 5, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 39 Defendants Motion to Vacate Proposed Pretrial Order Deadline and Final Pretrial Conference, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/5/2013.(ervsl, )
April 23, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Magistrate Judges Recommendation ECF No. 49 is ADOPTED in its entirety; Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 37 is GRANTED; and Judgment shall be entered in favor of Defendants Sgt. Kramer, Sgt. Adamic, and CO Christenson on all claims. Defendants shall have their costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 4/23/2014.(evana, )
April 24, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT. re: 55 IT IS ORDERED that the Magistrate Judge's Recommendation 49 is ADOPTED in its entirety. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 37 is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Final Judg ment is entered in favor of Defendants Sgt. Kramer, Sgt. Adamic, and CO. O. Christenson on all claims, and the action and complaint are dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants are awarded their costs upon the filing of a Bill of Costs with the Clerk of Court within fourteen days' entry of Final Judgment, by Deborah Hansen, deputy clerk on 4/24/2014. (dhans, )
December 10, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended §1915 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff at the following addresses: David A. Thornton #92161 4335 Malaya Street Denver, CO 80249 and #92161 Fremont Correctional Facility P.O. Box 999 Cann City, Colorado 81215, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/10/12. (lygsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thornton v. Kramer et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adamic
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: O. Christenson
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kramer
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Teresa Starnella
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David A. Thornton
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]