Grange Insurance Association v. Ken's Electric, LLC

Defendant: Ken's Electric, LLC
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Association
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03201
Filed: December 6, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Other Personal Property Damage
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 21, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 13 Motion to Dismiss Complaint for Failure to Timely File Certificate of Review, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/21/2013.(rpmcd )
July 2, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 19 Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer: the Amended Answer attached as Exhibit A [19-1] is filed as of today's date, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/2/2013.(rpmcd)
July 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Motion to Amend 18 : Defendant shall file its expert witness disclosures no later than August 15, 2013; and Plaintiff shall file any rebuttal expert disclosures on or before August 30, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 7/19/2013.(rpmcd)
October 1, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 26 Motion to Modify 18 : Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2013 and request to set a time for filing pre-trial motions is denied, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/1/2013.(rpmcd)
November 15, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference, it is ORDERED that a pretrial conference is scheduled for January 10, 2014, at 11:00 a.m. in the Conference Room, Second Floor, the Byron White United States Courthouse, 1823 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The proposed Final Pretrial Order, original only, shall be delivered in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on January 2, 2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/15/2013. (ervsl, )
April 11, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 5/16/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/8/2014 in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/11/2014. (jsmit)
May 16, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Jury Trial for 9/8/2014 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/16/2014. (jsmit)
August 15, 2014 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING TRIAL AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR DISMISSAL PAPERS re 46 : the trial set for September 8, 2014 is vacated and the parties shall file dismissal papers on or before August 29, 2014, (Dismissal Paper due by 8/29/2014), by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/15/2014. (jsmit)
August 29, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear their own attorney's fees and costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/29/2014. (jsmit)
February 7, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/26/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on March 21, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/7/2013. (rpmcd)
February 8, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court Minute ORDER Granting 8 Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference for 4/2/2013 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room and proposed scheduling order must be submitted in paper form directly to chambers on or before March 28, 2013, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/8/2013.(rpmcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grange Insurance Association v. Ken's Electric, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken's Electric, LLC
Represented By: Peter S. Dusbabek
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Insurance Association
Represented By: Sarah Earle Killeen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]