Olds et al v. Bank of America N.A.

Plaintiff: Robert S. Olds and Bonnie L. Olds
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03210
Filed: December 7, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 15:0053 Federal Trade Commission Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting 23 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First AmendedComplaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) [# 18 ] is granted. The plaintiffs' amended complaint [# 14 ] isDISMISSED without prejudice. This case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 9/11/2013.(klyon, )
September 13, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Bank of America N.A. against Bonnie L. Olds, Robert S. Olds re: 31 Order by Clerk on 9/13/2013. (klyon, )
December 27, 2012 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying without prejudice 6 Motion to Dismiss. The Complaint is STRICKEN for failure to comply. Plaintiffs shall have until 1/2/2013 to submit an amended complaint. Plaintiffs' failure to comply with this order may result in a recommendation that the plaintiffs' case be dismissed. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/27/12. (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Olds et al v. Bank of America N.A.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert S. Olds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie L. Olds
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America N.A.
Represented By: Victoria Elena Edwards
Represented By: Justin Donald Balser
Represented By: Jill Ann Weeldreyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]