Malloy v. Cold Stone Creamery, et al

Defendant: Anjali Sarwal and Cold Stone Creamery
Plaintiff: Taylre Malloy
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03212
Filed: December 9, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 11, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 9 Motion for Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective Order (9-1) is approved and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2013. (mjwcd)
February 11, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2013. (mjwcd)
April 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 19 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Vacate Show Cause Hearing. Show Cause Hearing 4/4/2013 09:00 AM is vacated. Order to Show Cause 14 is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/1/2013.(mjwcd)
August 20, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion to Vacate Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference 8/20/2013 03:00 PM is vacated. Dismissal Paper due by 9/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/20/2013.(mjwcd)
November 4, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/4/2013.(mjwcd)
January 15, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 53 the Parties Stipulated Motion to Dismiss WITH PREJUDICE. Each party shall pay his/her or its own attorneys fees and costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 1/15/2014.(ervsl, )
December 11, 2012 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 12/11/2012. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Malloy v. Cold Stone Creamery, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anjali Sarwal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cold Stone Creamery
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylre Malloy
Represented By: Raymond K. Bryant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]