Carbajal et al v. Morrissey et al

Defendant: Richard (I) Hagan, Mitchell R. Morrissey, Mitchell (I) R. Morrissey, Jay (I) Lopez, Richard Hagan, Michael Simpson, Michael (I) Simpson, Jay Lopez, Lara (I) Mullin, Robert Fuller, Robert (I) Fuller, Rebekah Melnick, Rebekah (I) Melnick, Lara Mullin, Jeffrey Watts, Jeffrey (I) Watts, John (I) Suthers, John Suthers, Wells Fargo, Carol Dwyer, Carol (I) Dwyer, Brian Berardini, (I) Keefer, Miles Flesche, Miles (I) Flesche, Keith Criswell, Keith (I) Criswell, Anne Mansfield, Anne (I) Mansfield and Keefer
Plaintiff: Victoria Carbajal, Dean Carbajal and Luis Leal
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03231
Filed: December 11, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Montrose
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 21, 2013 109 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Plaintiff's 92 Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to the Court's Order [DOC #89] is denied as moot. The 106 Motion to Extend Time to Answer or Otherwise Plead is granted. Defendants Keefer, Simpson, Lopez, and Hagan shall file an answer or other response to 90 Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint on or before 7/8/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/21/13.(mnfsl, )
October 3, 2013 141 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 139 Motion to Clarify. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 18, 2013, Plaintiffs shall file a Response to the following Motion to Dismiss: #123. Considering the age of this Motion to Dismiss, no further extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of exceptional cause. Failure to file a Response will result in a Recommendation that Plaintiffs case be dismissed as to those Defendants seeking full dismissal in this Motion to Dismiss [#123], based on Plaintiffs failure to prosecute. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/3/2013.(trlee, )
November 13, 2013 162 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 158 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs' Response [# 145 ] is STRICKEN. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/2013.(klyon, )
January 13, 2014 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Motion to Reconsider. ORDERED that Plaintiffs Contemporaneous Objection to the Court's Order Overruling Plaintiffs Objection to Magistrate Judge Kristen Mix's November 13, 2013 Order [#176], filed January 8, 2014, construed as a motion to reconsider, is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 01/13/14. (jjhsl, )
January 15, 2014 178 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that the Motion [#135] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. The Clerk of Court is instructed to terminate Mr. Hader as counsel of record for Brandon Keefer only. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall terminate Brandon Keefer in both his official and individual capacities from this lawsuit by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 01/15/14.(jjhsl, )
February 11, 2014 180 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 165 Motion for Leave to File a Sureply [sic] to the Denver Defendants' Motions to Dismiss. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/11/2014.(klyon, )
February 18, 2014 184 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 182 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Response [Doc. #143] to His Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint [Doc. #103]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/18/2014.(klyon, )
March 31, 2014 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Objections to and Adopting 185 Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. The following motions are GRANTED: The State Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint [# 101 ];Defendant Berardini& #039;s Motion To Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [# 103 ];Motion To Dismiss Third Amended Complaint from Defendants Mitchell R. Morrissey, Jeffrey Watts, Robert Fuller[,] Rebekah Melnick, and Lara Mullin [# 105 ]; Ms. Williams' Motion To Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [# 114 ]; andMotion by Defendants Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Carol Dwyer, and Janell Kavanaugh To Dismiss Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) [# 119 ]. The Denver Defendants' Motion To Dismiss Plaintiff's Third AmendedComplaint [# 123 ] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Plaintiffs, Victoria Carbajal and Luis Leal, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption AMENDED accordingly. All defendants, other than Andrew Keefer, Deputy Sheriff for the Denver Sheriff's Department, in his individual capacity, are DROPPED as named parties to this action, and the case caption AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/31/2014.(klyon, )
April 24, 2014 208 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling Plaintiff's 207 Contemporaneous Objection to the Trial Court's Order Denying Counsel [# 200 ]. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 4/24/2014. (klyon, )
June 24, 2014 221 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Overruling 215 Objections to Nondispositive Order of Magistrate Judge. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
June 24, 2014 222 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying Plaintiff's 219 Motion for Leave to Appeal. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/24/2014.(klyon, )
July 2, 2014 225 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 223 Motion for Leave to Take Prisoner Deposition. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2014.(klyon, )
February 21, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. The Motion to Amend 30 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint [#30-1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendants who have already been served and entered their appearances in this case shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint [#30-1] on or before 3/14/2013. Defendants' Motions to Dismiss 18 , 20 , 24 are DENIED as moot. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/13. (kfinn, )
March 21, 2013 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; 57 Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. 63 Motion to Vacate Scheduling Conference and Stay All Proceedings is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/13 at 11:00 AM is VACATED and shall be reset if necessary after resolution of the pending dispositive motions, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/21/2013.(klmcd, )
April 12, 2013 80 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 75 Motion to Extend. Gilbert Hagan, Gilbert (I) Hagan, Keefer,(I) Keefer, Jay (I) Lopez, Jay Lopez, Michael Simpson and Michael (I) Simpson answer due 5/13/2013. Also granting 78 Motion to Clarify. Defendant City and County of Denver need not file a Reply to Plaintiff's Response untilafter resolution of the underlying Motion for Leave [# 40 ]. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2013. (klyon, )
April 17, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 81 Motion to Amend. Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [# 81 -1] is accepted for filing as of the date of this Minute Order. Defendants who have already been served and entered their appearances in this case shall answe r or otherwise respond to Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint [#81-1] on or before 5/7/2013. Plaintiffs shall serve any unserved Defendant(whether previously identified in the Amended Complaint or newly identified in the Second Amended Complain t) on or before 6/17/2013. The Motions [# 34 , # 41 , # 43 , # 50 , # 60 ], all of which are directed at or related to a pleading that is no longer operative, are DENIED as moot. The Motion for Leave [# 40 ] is GRANTED in part and DENIED AS MOOT in part. The Motion for Extension [# 45 ] is GRANTED in part, DENIED as moot in part, and DENIED without prejudice in part. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/17/2013.(klyon, )
April 23, 2013 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 86 Motion to Strike Plaintiff's 85 Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint [# 85 ] is STRICKEN. Plaintiff shall file a Third Amended Complaint on or before 5/24/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/23/2013.(klyon, )
June 4, 2013 94 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge. Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 38 , is APPROVED and ADOPTED. The objections stated in Plaintiffs Contemporaneous Objection to Magistrate Mix's Recommendation 38 87 , are OVERRULED. Plaintiffs' Petition for Federal Injunction Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P.65 4 , is DENIED by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 06/04/13.(jjhsl, )
January 2, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND ADVISEMENT TO PRO SE PLAINTIFFS. Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/2/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3, # 4 Attachment 4, # 5 Attachment 5) (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Carbajal et al v. Morrissey et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard (I) Hagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell R. Morrissey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell (I) R. Morrissey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay (I) Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Hagan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael (I) Simpson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Lopez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara (I) Mullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) Fuller
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah Melnick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebekah (I) Melnick
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lara Mullin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey (I) Watts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John (I) Suthers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Suthers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Dwyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol (I) Dwyer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Berardini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Keefer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles Flesche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miles (I) Flesche
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Criswell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith (I) Criswell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Mansfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne (I) Mansfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keefer
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria Carbajal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean Carbajal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Leal
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]