Brown v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al

Defendant: Colorado Casualty Company and Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Donna Ann Brown
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03298
Filed: December 18, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
February 27, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/27/2013. (kmtcd)
October 21, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Deadlines are extended only for non-written discovery as follows; Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/28/2014. The Final Pre trial Conference is vacated and RESET as a Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference for April 22, 2014 at 9:30 a.m. The parties shall initiate a conference call and contact chambers at 303-335-2780 at the time of the Final Pretrial Conference. A Final Pr etrial Order shall be prepared by the parties and submitted to the court no later than seven (7) days before the final pretrial conference. Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery from Plaintiff 28 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
January 7, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/19/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/7/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Brown v. Colorado Casualty Insurance Company et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Casualty Insurance Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Ann Brown
Represented By: Rosemary Orsini
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]