C.S. et al v. Platte Canyon School District No. 1 et al

Plaintiff: Michael Schaffer, Cynthia Schaffer and C.S.
Defendant: James (I) Walpole, Melissa Cooper, Daniel Deslauriers, Daniel (I) Deslauriers, Platte Canyon School District No. 1, James Walpole, Mike Schmidt, Meggin (I) Stout, Melissa (I) Cooper, Mike (I) Schmidt and Meggin Stout
Case Number: 1:2012cv03358
Filed: December 28, 2012
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/26/13. (bnbcd, )
May 1, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion To Dismiss Section 504 and ADA Claims Against Individual Defendants by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 5/1/13.(dkals, )
June 3, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 23 First Supplement to Civil Scheduling Order. The plaintiffs shall file and serve a second supplement to the Scheduling Order identifying the nature of the "Other Economic Damages" claimed by the plaintiffs and a good faith estimate of the amount of those "Other Economic Damages" by 6/7/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/3/13. (bnbcd, )
August 7, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Unopposed Motion to Modify the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/7/2013, Dispositive Motions due by 11/20/2013. Final Pretrial Conference reset to 1/23/2014 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Pretrial Order due by 1/16/2014. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/7/13.(bnbcd, )
November 18, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion To Dismiss, Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2), Certain Claims Against Certain Individual Defendants by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 11/18/13.(dkals, )
January 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/29/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/22/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/9/13. (bnbcd, )
September 23, 2014 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER on Denying Motion to Dismiss and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Motion for Summary Judgment. This Court GRANTS IN PART Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment (Doc. # 44 ) and DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE all of Plaintiff's federa l claims. It further DISMISSES WITHOUT PREJUDICE Plaintiff's state law claims. It further affirms the Recommendation of Magistrate Judge Boland (Doc. # 60 ). FURTHER, this Court DENIES or OVERRULES: 1. Defendants' Motion to Exclude (Do c. # 70 ) and Motion in Limine(Doc. # 71 ); 2. Defendants' Objections to the Recommendation (Doc. # 61 ); and 3. Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. # 31 ). The Final Trial Preparation Conference and Jury Selection, set for 10/14/2014, and the seven-day Jury Trial, set to commence 10/20/2014, are VACATED, and this case is DISMISSED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 09/23/2014. (athom, )
September 24, 2014 78 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 77 Order. Signed by Clerk on 09/24/2014. (athom, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: C.S. et al v. Platte Canyon School District No. 1 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Schaffer
Represented By: Gregory Miles Moore
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Schaffer
Represented By: Gregory Miles Moore
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C.S.
Represented By: Jack David Robinson
Represented By: Gregory Miles Moore
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James (I) Walpole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Deslauriers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel (I) Deslauriers
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte Canyon School District No. 1
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Walpole
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meggin (I) Stout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melissa (I) Cooper
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike (I) Schmidt
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meggin Stout
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]