Zirkle v. Eastman et al

Defendant: Kevin Stanley, Juanita Stanley, James Stanley and Blake Eastman
Plaintiff: Kiley Ashlen Zirkle
 
Case Number: 1:2012cv03368
Filed: December 28, 2012
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1364 Auto Negligence
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 22, 2013 26 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting in part 23 Unopposed Motion to Vacate 4/25/2013 Scheduling Conference and Reset for Later Date. The Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2013 at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 6/12/2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall submit the proposed scheduling order no later than 6/7/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/22/2013.(klyon, )
August 6, 2013 36 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Unopposed Motion to Vacate 8/19/2013 Scheduling Conference and Reset for Later Date. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2013at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 8/22/2013 at 2:30 p.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver,Colorado. Parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order pursuant to the District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Procedures. The parties shall submit the proposed scheduling order no later than 8/16/2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/6/2013.(klyon, )
August 23, 2013 39 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/30/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 6/6/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Five (5) day Jury Trial set for 6/23/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 8/23/13. (rebsec, )
September 18, 2013 46 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER striking 44 Notice of Deposition of James Stanley. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/2013.(klyon, )
March 3, 2014 49 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/3/2014. (klyon, )
January 3, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference set for 4/25/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/3/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (kfinn, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zirkle v. Eastman et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Stanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Stanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stanley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Eastman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiley Ashlen Zirkle
Represented By: Stephen H. Cook
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]