Smith v. GMAC Mortgage

Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Smith
Case Number: 1:2013cv00009
Filed: January 2, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Jefferson
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1345 Foreclosure
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 5, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/05/13 DENYING as unnecessary 8 Motion for Cured Deficiency; GRANTING 9 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; DENYING as moot 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis.(nmmsl, )
February 7, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 02/07/13. (nmmsl, )
March 18, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the complaint, the amended complaint, and the action are dismissed without prejudice. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/18/13. (sgrim)
March 18, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re: 13 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 3/18/13. (sgrim)
January 9, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/09/2013. (sks)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. GMAC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GMAC Mortgage
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew A. Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]