Gundlach v. May et al

Defendant: Debra Crosser, William May, Maria (I) Mora, Pamela (I) Jones, Eugene (I) McGuinn, Arif (I) Kamran, Robert McIntyre, Robert (I) McIntyre and Debra (I) Crosser
Plaintiff: Gabriele Gundlach
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00031
Filed: January 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2013 10 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANTS WILLIAM MAY AND ROBERT McINTYRE, ONLY, granting 8 Unopposed Motion To Dismiss With Prejudice The Claims for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief Against William May and Robert McIntyre and To Dismiss These Two Defendant With Prejudice. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 3/26/13.(mjgsl, )
March 29, 2013 12 Featured Case AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/29/2013. (kmtcd)
May 14, 2013 21 Featured Case ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay Discovery and Stay Further Proceedings. All discovery in this matter is hereby STAYED pending ruling on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. The Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2013 and all related deadlines are VACATED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/2013. (klyon, )
October 18, 2013 33 Featured Case ORDER adopting 32 Recommendations of the United States Magistrate Judge. Plaintiff's claims against defendant, Dr. Eugene McGuinn, physician atCMHIP in his personal capacity, are DISMISSED for failure to effectuate timely service of process. Defendant, Dr. Eugene McGuinn, physician at CMHIP in his personal capacity, is DROPPED as a named party to this action, and the case caption is AMENDED accordingly. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/18/2013.(klyon, )
October 31, 2013 34 Featured Case ORDER Overruling Objections to and Adopting Recommendation of the United States Magistrate Judge. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge [# 29 ] is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an order of this court. The objections stated in Plaintiff' s Objection to the Magistrate's Recommendation To Grant Defendants Motion To Dismiss [# 31 ] are OVERRULED. Defendants' Motion To Dismiss [# 15 ] is GRANTED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave To File Amended Complaint [# 23 ] is DENIED. Plaintiff's claims are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/31/2013. (klyon, )
October 31, 2013 35 Featured Case JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Debra Crosser, Debra (I) Crosser, Maria (I) Mora, Myra Kamran, Pamela (I) Jones against Gabriele Gundlach re: 34 Order, by Clerk on 10/31/2013. (klyon, )
January 8, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/08/2013. (sks)
January 14, 2013 6 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 1/14/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gundlach v. May et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Crosser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William May
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maria (I) Mora
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pamela (I) Jones
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene (I) McGuinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arif (I) Kamran
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (I) McIntyre
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra (I) Crosser
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gabriele Gundlach
Represented By: Alison Lee Ruttenberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]