Sandoval v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Lake, State of Colorado

Plaintiff: John Sandoval
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Lake, State of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00032
Filed: January 7, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Lake
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 28, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Stipulated Motion to Amend Case Caption. The Clerk is directed amend the case caption to change the defendants name to "Board of County Commissioners for the County of Lake, State of Colorado". By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/28/13.(mnfsl, )
August 5, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Protective Order. The written Stipulated Protective order (docket no. 28-1) is approved as amended in paragraphs 8, 19 and 20 and made an Order of Court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/13.(mnfsl, )
August 5, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/5/13. (mnfsl, )
January 9, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 3/5/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/9/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Sandoval v. Board of County Commissioners for the County of Lake, State of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Sandoval
Represented By: Christi Anne Sanders
Represented By: William Sidney Finger
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners for the County of Lake, State of Colorado
Represented By: Andrea M. Bronson
Represented By: Lindsey Dawn Parlin
Represented By: Timothy Peter Schimberg
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]