Rowe v. United Airlines, Inc.

Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Plaintiff: Mingyi Rowe
Case Number: 1:2013cv00055
Filed: January 10, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:2615 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Amendment to Proposed Scheduling Order. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/13.(bnbcd, )
August 2, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting and Affirming 31 Report and Recommendations: 12 Motion to Dismiss Counts III and IV of Plaintiffs Complaint is denied, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/2/13.(dkals, )
October 17, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/17/13. (dkals, )
August 4, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 41 Motion for Summary Judgment. Plaintiff's FMLA and ADA claims are dismissed with prejudice. Plaintiff's state law claims are dismissed without prejudice. The final trial preparation conference, currently scheduled for 8/8/14, and the three day jury trial, set to begin on 8/18/2014, are VACATED. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 08/04/2014. (athom, )
August 4, 2014 66 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of United Airlines, Inc. against Mingyi Rowe re: 65 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Clerk on 08/04/2014. (athom, )
January 10, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER transferring case from the Northern District of Illinois to the District of Colorado by Judge Ruben Castillo on 12/21/12. (dkals, )
January 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/12/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 3/5/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/25/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowe v. United Airlines, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Paul Ehrich Bateman
Represented By: Amanda Elaine Inskeep
Represented By: Erin Ashley Webber
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mingyi Rowe
Represented By: Gary David Abrams
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]