Fisher Sand and Gravel Co. v. Kirkland Construction, LLP

Defendant: Kirkland Construction, LLP and Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Plaintiff: Fisher Sand and Gravel Co.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00066
Filed: January 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Referring Judge: Michael E. Hegarty
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
 
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 30, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 4/30/13. (msksec, )
August 13, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 the Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/30/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 3/17/2014. Plaintiff's initial expert disclosures due by 10/28/2013. Defendants' initial expert disclosures due by 11/29/2013. Rebuttal expert disclosures due by 12/30/2013. Written discovery shall be served by 12/16/2013. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/13/2013. (mehcd)
August 28, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 31 Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 8/28/2013.(klyon, )
October 22, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 36 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 3/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 4/28/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/21/2013.(klyon, )
November 22, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 39 Third Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Paragraph 9 of the Scheduling Order in this case shall be modified as follows:Discovery Cut-off: Thursday, 4/8/2014. Dispositive Motions Deadline: 5/27/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/22/2013.(klyon, )
December 2, 2013 44 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 42 Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/2/2013.(klyon, )
December 10, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 45 the renewed Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/2013. (mehcd)
December 10, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court CONFIDENTIALITY AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/10/2013. (mehcd)
February 18, 2014 55 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 52 the Stipulated Motion to Modify Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/22/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/10/2014. Initial expert designations due by 2/28/2014. Rebuttal expert designations due by 3/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/18/2014. (mehcd)
April 17, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 56 the Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Close of Discovery, and granting in part and denying in part 57 the Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Allow Expert Depositions After the Close of Discovery. Discovery due by 5/7/2014. No further extensions of the discovery deadline will be granted absent showing of exceptional cause. The Court will permit the parties to depose the three experts identified in the motion on or before 7/31/2014. By Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/17/2014. (cpear)
May 6, 2014 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 60 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend Close of Discovery by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 5/6/14. Discovery is due by 5/30/2014. (dkals, )
June 10, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 63 Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order to Extend the Deadline for Filing Dispositive Motions by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 6/10/14. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/12/2014. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Fisher Sand and Gravel Co. v. Kirkland Construction, LLP
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirkland Construction, LLP
Represented By: Jason Patrick Kane
Represented By: Richard Paul Ranson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: Jason Patrick Kane
Represented By: Richard Paul Ranson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fisher Sand and Gravel Co.
Represented By: William James Garehime, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]