Scott v. Carlson

Defendant: Mary Carlson
Plaintiff: Lynn Eugene Scott
Case Number: 1:2013cv00069
Filed: January 14, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 7, 2014 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER The Court ADOPTS the Recommendation ECF No. 23 ; Plaintiffs Objection ECF No. 24 to the Magistrate Judges October 9, 2013 Recommendation is OVERRULED; Defendants Motion to Dismiss ECF No. 17 is GRANTED; Plaintiffs Motion to Amend ECF No. 21 is DENIED; Plaintiffs Motion to Set Settlement Conference ECF No. 26 is DENIED as MOOT because the Court has dismissed his case; and The Clerk shall enter judgment and close the case. Each party shall bear his or her own costs, by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/7/2014.(evana, )
February 10, 2014 29 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk in favor of Mary Carlson against Lynn Eugene Scott re: 28 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Report and Recommendations; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Final Judgment is entered in favor of Defendant and the action and complaint are dismissed. Each party shall pay his or her own costs. by Edward P. Butler, Deputy Clerk on 2/10/2014. (evana, )
January 14, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/14/2013. (skl)
August 5, 2014 57 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting the 31 MOTION for Extension of Time to file Appeal filed by Lynn Eugene Scott, Case reopened, by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/5/2014. (evana, )
August 5, 2014 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 56 Plaintiffs Motion for Relief JudgementPursuant to FRCP 60 by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/5/2014.(evana, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott v. Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Carlson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Eugene Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]