Toney v. Berkebile et al

Defendant: Sudlow, Madison, Berkebile, Hall, Rangel, R. Martinez, Redden and Kuta
Plaintiff: Joe M. Toney, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2013cv00111
Filed: January 17, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 11, 2013 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 98 Motion to Change Venue. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/11/2013.(trlee, )
December 20, 2013 106 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 104 Motion for Leave to File a Reply to the Defendants' Response by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/20/13.(dkals, )
January 9, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 113 Motion for Order permitting deposition of Federal Bureau of Prisons inmate Toney. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/9/2014.(trlee, )
April 2, 2014 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/2/14. The plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Motion for Order Permitting Depositions of Witnesses 124 is DENIED. The plaintiff's Motion for Production to Produce a Copy of the Scheduling Confere nce Transcripts from (Doc. 54) 128 is DENIED. The plaintiff's Motion to Reconsider Motion for Subpoena and Service by U.S. Marshal 132 is DENIED. Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Answer Defendants' Response 139 is GRANTED. The plaintiff's Motion for 7-Day Extension of Time to File a Reply 141 is GRANTED. (bsimm)
April 30, 2014 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 151 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Granting in part and denying in part 154 Motion for Extension of Time, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/30/2014.(trlee, )
May 21, 2014 163 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 149 Plaintiff's Motion to Recuse, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/21/2014. (eseam)
March 8, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 1 and 19 Motions requesting preliminary injunction, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/8/13.(sgrim)
March 11, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/11/2013. (skl)
March 25, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 29 Supplemental Complaint is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/25/13. (mnfsl, )
June 27, 2013 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 40 Motion to Seek Leave to File Amended Complaint. Any future attempts to amend the Amended Complaint must comply with my order of March 25, 2013; and Failure to comply with my orders may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 06/27/13. (alvsl)
January 18, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/18/2013. (skl)
July 29, 2013 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: IT IS ORDERED: (1) The Motion to Strike the Answer (Doc. # 48 ) is construed as a motion for entry of default against the defendants and is DENIED; (2) The Interrogatories (Doc. # 50 ) are STRICKEN; and (3) The Motion for Counsel (Doc. # 52 ) is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 07/29/13. (alvsl)
January 18, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/18/2013. (skl)
August 14, 2013 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 62 Motion to Join Motion for Appointment of Counsel. The plaintiff shall cease filing redundant motions. Failure to comply with this order may result in sanctions, including dismissal of this case, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 8/14/2013.(ervsl, )
September 16, 2013 72 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge (ECF No. 70 ) and Denying Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. 59 ). By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 09/16/13. (alvsl)
September 25, 2013 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion for Order by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/25/13.(bnbcd, )
October 30, 2013 84 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 74 Motion for Sanction for Failure to Make Disclosure and Cooperate in Discovery; granting 80 Motion for Request and Leave to File a Reply Response. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/30/13.(bnbcd, )
December 2, 2013 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 94 Motion for Leave to Answer Plaintiffs Amended Complaint by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/2/13.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toney v. Berkebile et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sudlow
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madison
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berkebile
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rangel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Martinez
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Redden
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kuta
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe M. Toney, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]