Zanotelli v. CF&I Steel, L.P.

Defendant: CF&I Steel, L.P.
Plaintiff: Landee Zanotelli
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00128
Filed: January 21, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
July 24, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three to five day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on June 23, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for June 20, 2014 at 8:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/24/2013. (rbjsec. )
October 23, 2013 22 Featured Case ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal with prejudice. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/23/2013.(trlee, )
January 24, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 01/24/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Zanotelli v. CF&I Steel, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CF&I Steel, L.P.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Landee Zanotelli
Represented By: Todd John McNamara
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]