Wood et al v. Ong

Plaintiff: Christopher Wood and Laurie Wood
Defendant: Jacob Liao Ong
Case Number: 1:2013cv00147
Filed: January 23, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Medical Malpractice
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 9, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 5/9/13. (msksec, )
October 30, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 26 Plaintiff Laurie Wood's Unopposed [Motion] toAmend the Complaint. The Amended Complaint (Docket No. 26-1) is accepted for filing and the Clerk is directed to file the Amended Complaint as of the date of this order. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/30/2013.(klyon, )
February 6, 2014 49 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/6/2014. Approving with the supplement 48 Motion / 46 Plaintiffs' Stipulated Motion for Court Approval of a Settlement of this Case. Plaintiffs' counsel shall file a supplement with the Court by 2/17/2014. Counsel may file a motion for leave to restrict access to the supplement. FTR: Courtroom A-502. (eseam)
February 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/11/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/13/2013. (mjwcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wood et al v. Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Wood
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurie Wood
Represented By: John J. Astuno, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Liao Ong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.