DePineda v. Medina

Petitioner: Manuel DePineda
Respondent: Angel Medina
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00152
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 8, 2013 10 Featured Case JUDGMENT re: 9 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 3/8/13. (sgrim)
January 23, 2013 3 Featured Case ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 1/23/2013. (skl)
February 7, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Pleading, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/07/2013. (skl)
March 8, 2013 9 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the habeas corpus application 1 and the amended application 8 are denied and the action is dismissed. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/8/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: DePineda v. Medina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Manuel DePineda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Angel Medina
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]