Grant v. Scott et al

Defendant: (I) Clement, Felzien, (I) Felzien, (I) Behrendsen, Behrendsen, Bernadette Scott, Bernadette (I) Scott and Clement
Plaintiff: Larry Neil Grant
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00153
Filed: January 22, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 29, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER to Dismiss in Part and Draw in Part by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/29/13. (dkals, )
September 30, 2013 39 Featured Case ORDER denying 36 Motion to Exclude. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/30/2013.(klyon, )
October 9, 2013 40 Featured Case ORDER granting in part and denying in part 33 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants Owens, Felzein, Clements, and Behrendsen are dismissed and these defendants shall be removed from the caption. Plaintif f's official-capacity claims for monetary relief against Defendant Scott are barred by the Eleventh Amendment and are dismissed. Plaintiff's Eighth Amendment claim is dismissed. Defendant Scott is entitled to qualified immunity on Plain tiff's § 1983 claim. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's ADA claim is denied. However, Plaintiff is limited to prospective injunctive relief only. The case shall proceed on this claim only, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/9/13.(sgrim)
October 9, 2013 41 Featured Case ORDER Setting Preliminary Scheduling Conference for 11/13/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Plaintiff, or his/her case manager, shall arrange for his/her participation via telephone and shall call (303) 335-2780 at the scheduled time, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/9/13. (sgrim)
February 25, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER to File Amended Prisoner Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/25/2013. (skl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Grant v. Scott et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Clement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felzien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Felzien
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: (I) Behrendsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Behrendsen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernadette (I) Scott
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clement
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Neil Grant
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]