Hartley v. Time Warner Cable NY, LLC

Plaintiff: Patrick G. Hartley
Defendant: Time Warner Cable NY, LLC
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00158
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Michael J. Watanabe
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
November 4, 2013 101 Featured Case ORDER Regarding Attorney Fees and Costs 58 and 95 . ORDERED that Plaintiff shall pay to the Defendant the sum of $2,500.00 in reasonable and necessary attorney fees for having to prepare, file, and attend a hearing on Defendant's Mot ion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fee (docket no. 58), a Reply (docket no. 78) and a Supplement (docket no. 90). Payment of the $2,500.00 shall be made on or before November 29, 2013 by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/04/13. (jjhsl, )
November 27, 2013 106 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying without prejudice 104 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 11/27/2013.(mjwcd)
February 11, 2014 128 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference / Motion Hearing held on 2/11/2014. Granting 118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Walker G. Harman, Jr terminated. D eadline for Defendant to file motion to enforce settlement 2/21/2014. STAY is lifted.Scheduling Order 23 is amended. Discovery due by 5/12/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 6/13/2014. Final Pretrial Conference 4/14/2014 10:30 AM is vacated. Pro posed Pretrial Order due by 8/5/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 8/12/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Defendant's Notice (Motion) of Withdrawal 87 is granted; withdrawing 45 Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLCs Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint and/or in the Alternative to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand. Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
February 11, 2014 129 Featured Case ORDER Granting 87 Notice (Motion)Withdrawing Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion for Partial Dismissal of Plaintiff's Complaint and/or in the Alternative, to Strike Plaintiff's Jury Demand 45 , filed by Time Warner NY Cable LLC ; Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal 45 is withdrawn. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 2/11/2014. (mjwcd)
March 13, 2014 134 Featured Case ORDER: Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion to Enforce Settlement or, Alternatively, for an Evidentiary Hearing, and Memorandum of Law in Support (docket no. 131 ) is set for an evidentiary hearing before MagistrateJudge Watanabe on May 20, 2014, at 9:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-502, Fifth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 3/13/2014. (klyon, )
January 30, 2013 13 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/21/2013 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/13. (mnfsl, )
April 7, 2014 140 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER Reserving ruling at this time on 135 The Harman Firm P.C.'s Motion to Quash Subpoena. On or before 4/15/2014, The Harman Firm P.C. shall file with the court at restricted access Level 2 and consistent with D.C.COLO.LCivR. 7.2 those documents requested in the subject subpoena for in camera review by this court. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/7/2014.(emill)
January 30, 2013 14 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 10 Motion to Ammend [sic] Caption/Defendant. The tendered amended complaint (Docket No. 10-1) is accepted for filing. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/30/13.(mnfsl, )
April 15, 2014 150 Featured Case ORDER denying 135 Motion to Quash; granting 136 Motion to Compel, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/15/2014.(trlee, )
April 8, 2013 31 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 27 Defendant Time Warner Cable LLC's Motion for Protective Order and Citation of Authority in Support. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/13.(mnfsl, )
April 8, 2013 32 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/8/13. (mnfsl, )
April 16, 2013 37 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: Denying 33 Plaintiff's Motion and Request for Emergency Hearing Re: Spoliation of Evidence. Denying 34 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Pleadings and Motion for Summary Judgement. Plaintiff's tendered Revised: Complaint and Jury Demand 35 is stricken. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 4/16/2013.(mjwcd)
August 13, 2013 69 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Status Conference held on 8/13/2013. Plaintiff's Oral Motions to withdraw motions is granted; withdrawing 24 Plaintiff's Motion for Certif ication Order: Class Action Certification (F.R.C.P. [Sic] 23) and Withdrawing 48 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendant to Provide Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P. [Sic] 37(a)(4). Plaintiff shall have up to and including 8/27/2013 to respond to Defendant's Motion to Compel and For Attorneys' Fees 58 . Deadline for Plaintiff to file Amended Complaint 8/27/2013. Court will address 45 Defendant's Motion for Partial Dismissal...when it decides the motion to file an amende d complaint. Scheduling Order 23 amended to extend discovery deadline for the limited purpose of taking the deposition of plaintiff, Patrick Hartley on 9/3/2013; Discovery due by 9/3/2013. Denying 63 Plaintiff's Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Notice to the Court and Motion to Continue Filed July 8, 2013 Court Reporter: FTR - Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
September 25, 2013 82 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order and to File a Second Amended Complaint (docket no. 73 ) is GRANTED. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Time Warner NY Cable LLC's Motion to Strike the Declaration of Walker G. Harman, Jr. Filed in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fee (docket no. 79 ) is DENIED. By Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 09/25/13. (alvsl)
October 11, 2013 94 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2013, granting in part and denying in part 58 Defendant's Motion to Compel and for Attorneys' Fees, and granting 85 Defendant's Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 1/13/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/13/2014. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 4/7/2014. Final Pretrial Conference reset for 4/14/2014 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. FTR: C. Pearson -- Courtroom A-502. (mehcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Hartley v. Time Warner Cable NY, LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick G. Hartley
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Time Warner Cable NY, LLC
Represented By: Josh Adam Marks
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]