Ouzts v. On-Site Marketing, Inc.

Defendant: On-Site Marketing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Susan Ouzts
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00164
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Wiley Y. Daniel
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that the parties Stipulation Of Dismissal Of Plaintiff's Fourth Claim For Relief With Prejudice 11 , is APPROVED. In accordance therewith, plaintiff, Susan Ouztss, fourth claim for relief is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 03/07/13. (jjhsl, )
May 20, 2013 21 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/20/13. (cbssec)
September 26, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER. ORDERED that the parties Joint Stipulation Of Dismissal With Prejudice 25 is GRANTED, and this matter is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Each party bears its own attorney fees and costs by Judge Wiley Y. Daniel on 09/26/13. (jjhsl, )
February 12, 2013 5 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/9/2013 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 02/12/13. (jjhsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ouzts v. On-Site Marketing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: On-Site Marketing, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Ouzts
Represented By: Erica Tick Grossman
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]