In re: SVS Holdings, Inc.

In_re: SVS Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Tom H. Connolly
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems Corporation and Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00169
Filed: January 23, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Broomfield
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
 
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:157b Bankruptcy Claim to be tried in U.S. District Court
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
June 11, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER granting 2 Motion by Dominion Voting Systems Corporation and DominionVoting Systems, Inc., to Withdraw the Reference. The General Order of Reference IS WITHDRAWN as to this case. This matter IS REFERRED again to thebankruptcy court for consi deration and resolution of all pretrial issues, including, inter alia, scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive motions, dispositive motions, and entry of a final pretrial order. On 6/20/2013, at 9:30 a.m., the parties shall contact the court's ad ministrative assistant to set thismatter for trial preparation conference and jury trial. Trial on the merits of the plaintiffs claims SHALL PROCEED in the United States District Court for the District of Colorado under Civil Action No. 13-cv-00169-REB. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/11/2013. (klyon, )
June 20, 2013 15 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE ORDER: Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/11/2014. Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Conference are set for 7/18/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Ten (10) Jury Trial set for 8/4/2014 08:30 AM in Courtroom A1001 before Judge Robert E. Blackburn. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 6/20/13. (rebsec, )
January 23, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER Directing Clerk to Refer 2 MOTION to Withdrawal of the Reference to the District Court filed by Dominion Voting Systems, Inc., Dominion Voting Systems Corporation by United States Bankruptcy Court Judge Howard Tallman on 1/23/2013. (agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: In re: SVS Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In_re: SVS Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom H. Connolly
Represented By: Brent Ross Cohen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems Corporation
Represented By: Eric E. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Voting Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Eric E. Johnson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]