Lewandowski v. Bank of America Corporation

Plaintiff: Darin Lewandowski
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00176
Filed: January 24, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Douglas
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 3/11/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/13/13. (mjgsl, )
April 11, 2013 29 Featured Case Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 4/11/2013. Ordered that Motion for Electronic Discovery Order 25 is Denied. Discovery Cut-off: December 31, 2013. Dispositive Motions deadline: January 31, 2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 04/29/14 at 9:15 a.m. Final Pretrial Order is due no later than 7 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. FTR: Jennifer Hawkins. (jjhsl, ) (Main Document 29 replaced on 4/12/2013) (jjhsl, ).
July 29, 2013 48 Featured Case STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/29/13. ORDERED that parties MUST fully comply with all provisions of D.C.ColoL.CivR. 7.2, specifically those provisions dealing with filing documents under seal. (cbssec)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lewandowski v. Bank of America Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darin Lewandowski
Represented By: Robert Chapman Roberts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Corporation
Represented By: Richard L. Etter
Represented By: Catherine S. Ryan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]