Valles v. Gen-X Clothing No 63 et al

Plaintiff: Hillary Valles
Defendant: Gen-X Clothing No 63 and Martin Collazo Rangel
Case Number: 1:2013cv00201
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to File Second Amended Complaint and Join Additional Parties. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (# 23 ) for filing as of the dat e of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants Gen-X Echo B, Inc. and Martin Collazo Rangel shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before July 24, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/02/13. (alvsl)
July 9, 2013 29 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: 12 Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) is denied as moot. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/09/13. (alvsl)
July 23, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the 36 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to Withdraw Her Motion For Leave to File Her Third Amended Complaint By Adding New Party Defendants is GRANTED and 35 Plaintiff's Motion For Leave to File Her Third Amended Complaint By Adding New Party Defendants is deemed WITHDRAWN. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/23/13. (alvsl)
July 24, 2013 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 33 Unopposed Motion to Consider Forthwith GENX's Partial Motion to Dismiss as to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (# 12 ) is REINSTATED. When the Court considers the Partial Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) (# 12 ), the Court will treat it as responding to the Fourth Cause of Action included in the now operative Second Amended Complaint (# 27 ). By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 07/24/13. (alvsl)
September 9, 2013 45 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 43 Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/9/13.(dkals, )
October 30, 2013 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting Report and Recommendations re 48 and Report and Recommendations 53 . granting 12 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and denying 41 Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 10/30/2013.(trlee, )
November 26, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 55 Motion to Dismiss Defendant Gen-X Echo B, Inc. by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 11/26/2013.(trlee, )
March 10, 2014 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Recommendation 58 is MODIFIED as stated herein and the Plaintiff's remaining claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 3/10/2014.(trlee, )
February 14, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 5/20/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/14/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klyon, )
March 11, 2014 60 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT - Plantiff's remaining claims are hereby dismissed without prejudice. Each party shall pay her or its own costs. by Clerk on 3/11/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valles v. Gen-X Clothing No 63 et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hillary Valles
Represented By: Ralph Emerson Lamar, IV
Represented By: John Arthur Cimino
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gen-X Clothing No 63
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Collazo Rangel
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]