Berg v. M.D.C. Holdings, Inc

Plaintiff: Sheryl Berg
Defendant: M.D.C. Holdings, Inc
Case Number: 1:2013cv00202
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Robert E. Blackburn
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 18:1514A Sarbanes-Oxley Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 14, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER re 16 Motion for Protective Order. Gillard v. Boulder Valley School District, 196 F.R.D. 382 (D. Colo. 2000), set out certain requirements for the issuance of a blanket protective order such as the one sought here. Among other thi ngs, any information designated by a party as confidential must first be reviewed by a lawyer who will certify that the designation as confidential is "based on a good faith belief that [the information] is confidential or otherwise entitled to protection." Id. at 386. The proposed Protective Order does not comply with the requirements established in Gillard. Therefore, it is ORDERED that the Motion for Protective Order (Doc. No. 16 ) is DENIED without prejudice, and the proposed Protective Order is REFUSED. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 05/14/13. (alvsl)
February 1, 2013 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/1/2013. (kmtcd)
February 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/2/2013 10:15 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/22/2013. (kmtcd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Berg v. M.D.C. Holdings, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheryl Berg
Represented By: Diane Smith King
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.D.C. Holdings, Inc
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]