Estate of Shirley A. Cardinale v. SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating Company LLC

Defendant: SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating Company LLC
Plaintiff: Estate of Shirley A. Cardinale
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00211
Filed: January 28, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Pueblo
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
February 13, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 3/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 2/13/13. (mnfsl, )
May 28, 2013 36 Featured Case STIPULATED CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/28/13. Parties are advised that nothing in this signed protective order circumvents their obligation to comply with Local Rule 7.2 when filing document under seal. (cbssec)
September 3, 2013 38 Featured Case ORDER OF DISMISSAL. All claims by and between plaintiff and defendant are dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear its own costs and attorneys' fees. This case shall be closed in its entirety. By Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 9/3/13. (mnfsl, )
January 29, 2013 7 Featured Case ORDER of Recusal directing reassignment to another Judge. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 1/29/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Estate of Shirley A. Cardinale v. SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating Company LLC
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SSC Pueblo Belmont Operating Company LLC
Represented By: Thomas Baker Quinn
Represented By: David Matthew Clarke
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Shirley A. Cardinale
Represented By: Chad Patrick Hemmat
Represented By: Ethan Andrew McQuinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]