Jackson v. Teller County, Colorado et al

Defendant: Mike Emsinger, Teller County, Colorado, Teller County Sheriff's Office and Niklos Pinell
Plaintiff: Nicole Jackson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00216
Filed: January 28, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Teller
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/23/2013 at 10:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on May 16, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/16/2013. (rpmcd)
April 22, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court Stipulation and PROTECTIVE ORDER re 22 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/22/2013. (rpmcd)
April 22, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO COMPLY WITH D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2: in all court filings, counsel shall comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.2 as to any information to be submitted under restriction based on the 23 Protective Order, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/22/2103. (rpmcd )
December 4, 2013 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Amend SCHEDULING ORDER DEADLINES re [29}: Expert Designations 2/29/14, Rebuttal Expert Designation 4/30/14, Discovery due by 5/29/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 6/30/2014. by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 12/4/2013.(rpmcd )
February 20, 2014 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Amend 29 Scheduling Order: Expert Designations 3/28/14, Contradicting Expert Designations 4/28/14, Rebuttal Expert Designations 5/30/14, Discovery due by 6/27/2014, and Dispositive Motions due by 7/30/2014, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 2/20/2014.(rpmcd)
April 11, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, each party to bear her or his costs and attorney fees, in full, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 4/11/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Teller County, Colorado et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mike Emsinger
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teller County, Colorado
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teller County Sheriff's Office
Represented By: Sara Ludke Cook
Represented By: Gordon Lamar Vaughan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Niklos Pinell
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Jackson
Represented By: Robert Stephen Hall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]