Veren v. USA et al

Defendant: Kraus, USA, Department of Justice, Harley G. Lappin, Mona Smith, Mary Herndon, Tsuda and Mark Ippolito
Plaintiff: David W. Veren
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00235
Filed: January 30, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Chaffee
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
March 6, 2013 12 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/06/13, Directing Plaintiff to Submit Amended Motion for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and DENYING AS MOOT 11 Motion To Proceed Non-P.L.R.A. filed 3/6/13. (nmmsl, )
April 8, 2013 17 Featured Case ORDER Directing Plaintiff to File an Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 04/08/13. (nmmsl, )
August 15, 2013 19 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the Bivens and FTCA false imprisonment claims are dismissed with prejudice. Defendants Harley G. Lappin, Mary Herndon, Mona Smith, Dr. Tsuda, Dr. Kraus, Mark Ippolito, and John and Jane Does are terminated as impro perly named parties to this action. The remaining FTCA medical malpractice claim as asserted against the United States shall be assigned to District Judge Wiley Y. Daniel, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1C.1., and to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/15/13. (sgrim)
August 23, 2013 26 Featured Case ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE FOR PRO SE PLAINTIFF Status Conference set for 9/23/2013 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe, by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 8/23/2013. (mjwcd)
October 11, 2013 38 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER granting 35 Motion for Leave to file third amended complaint. Plaintiff is directed to file his Third Amended Complaint with the court on or before October 22, 2013. Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint may only contain the changes as outlined on page 2 of plaintiff's motion. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 10/11/2013.(trlee, )
November 25, 2013 48 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe: Scheduling Conference held on 11/25/2013. Granting 44 Defendant's Motion to Stay Discovery. Discovery is STAYED. Deadline for Plaintiff to respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss 43 is 1/17/2014. Status Conference set for 1/27/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe. Court Reporter: FTR -Ellen E. Miller. FTR: Courtroom A502. (mjwcd)
January 16, 2014 56 Featured Case MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 43 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, granting 52 Motion for Leave to file a fourth amended complaint and denying as moot 53 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Watanabe on 1/16/2014.(trlee, )
April 7, 2014 70 Featured Case ORDER of Dismissal without prejudice, by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/7/2014. (trlee, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Veren v. USA et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kraus
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Justice
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harley G. Lappin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mona Smith
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Herndon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tsuda
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Ippolito
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David W. Veren
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]