Rickert v. Farnsworth, et al

Plaintiff: Jason Lee Rickert
Defendant: David Kaplan, Patti Booth, Revada Farnsworth and Cherie LNU
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00252
Filed: January 31, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Christine M. Arguello
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
June 9, 2014 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADOPTING AND AFFIRMING 96 APRIL 14, 2014RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Defendants' 87 Motion for Summary Judgment is granted. Plaintiff's 97 Motion for Extension of Time is denied as moot. The claims against Defendant are dismissed with prejudice. The case is dismissed in its entirety. By Judge Christine M. Arguello on 06/09/2014. (athom, )
June 10, 2014 101 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 100 Order on Report and Recommendations. Signed by Clerk on 06/10/2014. (athom, )
March 1, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Amended Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/01/2013. (skl)
April 3, 2013 21 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/03/2013. (skl)
February 1, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/01/2013. (skl)
May 8, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The request for copies 34 is DENIED; The letters 36 and 37 are STRICKEN; The Motion for Counsel 35 is DENIED;The Motion to Deny Extension [ 39] is DENIED. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/8/13.(bnbcd, ) Modified on 5/8/2013 to relate documents (bnbcd, ).
May 17, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 46 Motion to Amend Caption to Correct Defendants' Names. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/17/13.(bnbcd, )
October 29, 2013 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 73 Motion to Proceed Without Discovery. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 10/29/13.(bnbcd, )
November 7, 2013 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 76 Motion for Updated Policy by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 11/7/13.(dkals, )
December 9, 2013 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Strike, and striking 80 Request for Admissions, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/9/13.(dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Rickert v. Farnsworth, et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Lee Rickert
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Kaplan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patti Booth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Revada Farnsworth
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cherie LNU
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]