Barkow v. City of Aurora

Defendant: City of Aurora
Plaintiff: Annie Barkow
Case Number: 1:2013cv00275
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act (ADA)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference and Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting for 6/26/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401, before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 5/22/13. (dkals, )
October 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this matter with prejudice by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/29/13. (dkals, )
May 14, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Recusal. A Magistrate Judge shall disqualify himself in any proceeding in which his impartiality might be reasonably be questioned. 28 U.S.C. § 455(a). In order to avoid the appearance of impropriety, I hereby recuse myself from the above entitled action. The Clerk of the Court shall assign another magistrate judge to this case, by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 5/14/2013. (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barkow v. City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Barkow
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.