Gerard, Jr. et al v. New Elk Coal Company, LLC et al

Defendant: Strategic Staffing Solutions and New Elk Coal Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Cox and James Gerard, Jr.
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00277
Filed: February 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Mesa
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M. Tafoya
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:2101 Worker Adjustment and Retaining Notification Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2013 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/4/2013. (kmtcd)
June 12, 2013 41 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 38 Motion for Protective Order, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/12/13.(sgrim)
June 14, 2013 43 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/14/13. (sgrim)
July 25, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing held on 7/25/2013 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Interested Party TK Mining Services LLCs Motion to Quash or Modify Subpoena 37 is DENIED AS MOOT. Defendant New Elk Coal Companys Motion for Protective Order and Objections to the Subpoena Served on Non-Party TK Mining Services, LLC 38 is DENIED AS MOOT. FTR: S. Grimm. (sgrim)
February 13, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 5/9/2013 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 2/13/2013. (kmtcd)
October 1, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: The Court ORDERS that Plaintiff's "Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2)" (Doc. No. 53 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiffs may file their "First Amended Class Action Complaint" no later than October 4, 2013. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/01/13. (alvsl)
March 10, 2014 93 Opinion or Order of the Court COURTROOM MINUTES for Motion Hearing and Scheduling Conference held on 3/11/2014 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. ORDERED: Defendant New Elk is directed to produce Exhibit B as described by the parties in their papers, to the Plaintif f on or before March 10, 2014. The Court understands Exhibit B to be a settlement agreement. Therefore the document will be designated confidential and produced under the provisions of the protective order entered in the case. Plaintiff's Mot ion to Compel Discovery from Defendants New Elk Coal Company, LLC and Cline Mining Corporation and Extend the Phase One Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines 80 is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. Further discovery is stayed, excluding t he completion of Phase 1 discovery and the completion of any discovery discussed herein, pending District Judge Moores resolution of the parties' summary judgment motions. Parties are directed to submit a Status Report within 5 days of Judge Moo re' s ruling stating the outcome of the ruling and further discovery requirements. The Proposed Scheduling Order is rejected at this time. FTR: S. Grimm - C201. (sgrim) Modified on 3/11/2014 to indicate a Scheduling Conference was also held.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Gerard, Jr. et al v. New Elk Coal Company, LLC et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Strategic Staffing Solutions
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Elk Coal Company, LLC
Represented By: M. Robin Repass
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cox
Represented By: Sander N. Karp
Represented By: Michael Vance McCrary
Represented By: David Christopher Tufts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Gerard, Jr.
Represented By: Michael Vance McCrary
Represented By: Sander N. Karp
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Olsen
Represented By: David Christopher Tufts
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]