Longoria v. Falk et al

Respondent: James Falk and Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Petitioner: Billy Lee Longoria
Case Number: 1:2013cv00283
Filed: February 1, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 28, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the habeas corpus application ECF No. 1 is denied and the action is dismissed as barred by the one-year limitation period in 28 U.S.C. § 2244(d). It is FURTHER ORDERED that no certificate of appealability will issue because Appli cant has not made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/28/2013. (ervsl, )
October 8, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 16 Motion for Service of Court Order by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/8/13.(dkals, )
July 25, 2014 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Reinstating Case by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/25/14. (dkals, )
July 29, 2014 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Assigning Case and for Answer by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/29/14. (dkals, )
July 29, 2014 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for State Court Record by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/29/14. (dkals, )
February 4, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/04/2013. (skl)
October 17, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 39 Motion to Appoint Counsel ; denying 40 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing; denying 41 Motion for Order for Production of State Court Record, by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/17/2014.(evana, )
October 21, 2014 44 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT re: 43 Order on Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus by Clerk on 10/21/2014. (agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longoria v. Falk et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Falk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Billy Lee Longoria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.