Ruby v. Beecher Carlson Holdings, Inc.

Defendant: Beecher Carlson Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anthony Ruby
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00284
Filed: February 4, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Referring Judge: Craig B. Shaffer
 
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2601 Family and Medical Leave Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
May 22, 2013 20 Featured Case COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer: Telephonic Status Conference/Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2013, denying 16 Motion for Stay of Formal Discovery. FTR: C. Covington -- Courtroom A-402. (mehcd)
July 18, 2013 30 Featured Case STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 7/18/13. (cbssec)
September 3, 2013 36 Featured Case TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER - CIVIL by Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 9/3/13. (msksec, )
March 4, 2013 8 Featured Case ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RULE 26(f) PLANNING MEETING. Scheduling and Planning Conference set for 4/22/2013 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer. By Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer on 3/4/2013. (klyon, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Ruby v. Beecher Carlson Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beecher Carlson Holdings, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Ruby
Represented By: Beth Ann Doherty Quinn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]