Burgess v. Daniels

Petitioner: Corey Burgess
Respondent: Charles A. Daniels
Case Number: 1:2013cv00293
Filed: February 4, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 8 Motion for Reconsideration, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/2013.(skl)
March 12, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to File Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/12/2013. (skl)
April 17, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE AMENDED REPLY re: 1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Corey Burgess, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 4/17/13. (lswsl )
May 2, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that habeas corpus claims one and three are dismissed without prejudice for failure to exhaust administrative remedies, and conditions-of- confinement claim two is dismissed without prejudice as inappropriately raised in a habeas corpus action. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the habeas corpus application is denied without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied. It is FURTHER ORDERED that any pending motions 28 are denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/2/13.(mjgsl, )
May 2, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT by Clerk re: 30 Order of Dismissal. (mjgsl, )
May 21, 2013 37 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 36 Motion for Clarification of Proper Procedure by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/21/13.(dkals, )
June 18, 2013 46 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 45 Proposed Order to Show Cause for a Preliminary Injunction/Temporary Restraining Order by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/18/13.(dkals, )
June 25, 2013 48 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 47 Applicants motion for certificate of appealability, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/25/2013.(ervsl, )
February 5, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiency, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 2/05/2013. (skl)
July 17, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying as moot 50 Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment or Findings or Additional Findings by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 7/17/13.(dkals, )
January 2, 2014 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 52 Motion to to reconsider. by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/2/2014.(trlee, )
October 27, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to Amend Order of January 2, 2014 by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 10/27/14. (dkals, )
February 22, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. FURTHER ORDERED that the request 6 by Mr. Burgess for a copy of the Local Rules of Practice for this Court is denied as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of the Court supplement the docketing records for ECF No. 6 and this action to indicate that the clerk of the Court mailed a copy of the Local Rules to Mr. Burgess on February 19, 2013, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 2/22/13.(sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burgess v. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Corey Burgess
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Charles A. Daniels
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]