Chawla v. Lockheed Martin Corporation

Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Plaintiff: Muneeb Chawla
Case Number: 1:2013cv00333
Filed: February 7, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Arapahoe
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 24, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER; Defendant's 10 Unopposed Motion to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference is GRANTED. Scheduling Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 10:30 is VACATED and RESET to 5/29/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/24/2013.(klmcd, )
June 10, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Motion for Protective Order. It is further ORDERED: The Protective Order 18 supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/10/2013.(klmcd)
June 10, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/10/2013. (klmcd)
December 30, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 29 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order to Extend the Discovery Cut-off and Dispositive Motion Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/14/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/30/13.(mnfsl, )
April 28, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Case for Trial. Jury Trial set for 10/6/2014 08:00 AM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer. Trial Preparation Conference set for 9/19/2014 at 01:30 PM before Judge Philip A. Brimmer by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 04/28/14. (jhawk, )
February 21, 2013 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 5/23/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/21/13. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (mnfsl, )
September 22, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. ORDERED that Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment [Docket No. 34] is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. ORDERED that Dr. Chawla's first, second, third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims for relief are DISMISSED with prejudice. OR DERED that Dr. Chawla's seventh, eighth, ninth, tenth, and eleventh claims for relief are DISMISSED without prejudice. ORDERED that, within 14 days of the entry of judgment, defendant may have its costs by filing a bill of costs with the Clerk of the Court. ORDERED that this case is dismissed in its entirety by Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 09/22/14.(jhawk, )
September 23, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court Final Judgment. ORDERED that judgment is hereby entered in favor of defendant and against the plaintiff. ORDERED that defendant Lockheed Martin Corporation is AWARDED its costs to be taxed by the Clerk of the Court pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 54.1. ORDERED that this case is CLOSED by Clerk on 09/23/14. (jhawk, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chawla v. Lockheed Martin Corporation
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lockheed Martin Corporation
Represented By: David Daniel Powell, Jr.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Muneeb Chawla
Represented By: Katherine Winnette Beckman
Represented By: Bryan E. Kuhn
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]