Gilles v. Ford Motor Company

Plaintiff: John A. Gilles
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2013cv00357
Filed: February 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Weld
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 19, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a 10 day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on April 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 20, 2015 at 8:00 a.m. See order for additional details. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/19/2013. (rbjsec.)
September 23, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a 10 day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on April 20, 2015 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for March 20, 2015 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 09/23/2013. (rbjsec. )
January 24, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Parties are to submit, within ten days from the date of this order, supplemental briefing of no more than five pages per side on the narrow question of whether the FTC regulations preempt Mr. Gilles's claims under the doctrine of field preemption. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 1/24/14. (rbjcd, )
February 12, 2014 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 16 Motion to Dismiss by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/12/14.(rbjcd, )
February 11, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 02/11/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilles v. Ford Motor Company
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John A. Gilles
Represented By: Erik G. Fischer
Represented By: Gordon Michael Hadfield
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Edward Craig Stewart
Represented By: Theresa R. Wardon
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]