Holub v. Gdowski et al

Defendant: Adams 12 Five Start School District, Shelly Becker, Mark Hinson and Chris Gdowski
Plaintiff: Gina Holub
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00363
Filed: February 11, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Adams
Presiding Judge: Richard P. Matsch
 
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
April 24, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Scheduling Conference held on 4/24/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Motion to Join Plaintiffs, 8 , is denied but coordinated discovery permitted. Discovery stayed until scheduling order. No scheduling order entered.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
May 29, 2013 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 16 Motion for Leave to File Amended 1 Complaint and attached [16-1] thereto is accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/29/2013.(rpmcd)
June 28, 2013 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 21 Motion to Dismiss Party Party Norm Jennings withoutprejudice, with leave to refile, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/28/2013. Motion 19 terminated. (rpmcd )
September 10, 2013 28 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motion Hearing held on 9/10/2013 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel and for Sanctions 25 , is granted with respect to the motion to compel and denied with respect to request for sanctions. Defendant shall produce Ms. Herrmann's report.FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd )
September 16, 2013 31 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER re 29 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/16/2013. (rpmcd)
October 9, 2013 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 30 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re [30-1]: and the second amended complaint is filed as of this date, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 10/9/2013.(rpmcd)
November 20, 2013 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Motion for Designation of Documents as Confidential Pursuant to the Protective Order: Vody Herrmann's report and any unaudited financial records produced by Defendants may be marked as confidential pursuant to the Protective Order in this lawsuit, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 11/20/2013.(rpmcd )
March 11, 2014 50 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 3/11/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Documents 43 , is granted with respect to the 2010 and 2011 Financial Records. 2011, 2012/2013 Funds (d etails included), and denied with respect to Mr. Gdowski's records, as stated on record. Defendants' Motion for Limited Extension of Discovery Cut-Off 46 , with respect to the dispositive motions deadline is extended to March 31, 2014. Pretrial conference set June 6, 2014 at 2:00 p.m. FTR: K. Terasaki. (rpmcd)
March 11, 2014 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Pretrial Conference for 6/6/2014 at 02:00 PM in Conference Room, Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/29/2014, in paper form directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m., and lead counsel present in person, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/11/2014. (rpmcd )
May 28, 2014 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 64 Motion for Leave o File Sur-Reply re 61 / 55 : the attached Sur-Reply [64-1] and Exhibit [64-2] are accepted and filed today by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/28/2014.(jsmit )
May 29, 2014 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE re 67 : the pretrial conference scheduled for June 23, 2014 is vacated, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 5/29/2014. (jsmit )
March 18, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 4/24/2013 at 11:30 AM in Conference Room, proposed order (original only) on paper, shall be submitted directly to chambers by 4:00 p.m. on April 18, 2013, lead counsel present in person and no parties permitted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 3/18/2013. (rpmcd )
June 18, 2014 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 70 Motion for Leave re 55 : Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply is hereby accepted for filing re 71 / 66 , by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 6/18/2014.(jsmit)
August 25, 2014 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 78 Motion for Leave to Correct the Summary Judgment Record: Plaintiff's correction as stated in docket number 79 is accepted, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 8/25/2014.(jsmit)
September 4, 2014 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 81 Unopposed Motion to Respond to Plaintiff's Correction of Summary Judgment Record: Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Correction of Summary Judgment Record, [81-2], is hereby accepted for filing, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/4/2014. (jsmit)
September 10, 2014 85 Opinion or Order of the Court Courtroom Minutes for Motions Hearing held on 9/10/2014 before Judge Richard P. Matsch. ORDERED: Defendants Hinson and Jennings are dismissed pursuant to plaintiff's request doc. 57 Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 55 and Defendants' Motion to Stay Pending Immunity Determinations 63 , stand submitted and are taken under advisement. FTR: K. Terasaki. (jsmit)
September 12, 2014 86 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER: Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment 55 is granted. The clerk shall enter judgment for Defendants, dismissing this civil action and awarding costs, by Judge Richard P. Matsch on 9/12/2014. (jsmit)
September 12, 2014 87 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re 86 : this civil action is dismissed and defendants are awarded costs upon the filing of a bill of costs within 14 days, by Clerk on 9/12/2014. (jsmit)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Holub v. Gdowski et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adams 12 Five Start School District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly Becker
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Hinson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Gdowski
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Holub
Represented By: Robert Mark Liechty
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]