Lamoure v. Libbey Glass, Inc.

Defendant: Libbey Glass, Inc.
Plaintiff: Arielle Lamoure
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00489
Filed: February 25, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Summit
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 5/22/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/12/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )
April 11, 2013 16 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 11 Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall accept Plaintiffs Second Amended Complaint and Jury Demand [11-1] for filing as of the date of this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before April 25, 2013, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/11/2013.(ervsl, )
April 2, 2014 39 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14 Granting 37 Unopposed Motion for Entry of Stipulated Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Stipulated Protective Order [#37-1] supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of the Minute Order. (lgale)
April 2, 2014 40 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/14. (lgale)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Lamoure v. Libbey Glass, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Libbey Glass, Inc.
Represented By: Jason D. Melichar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arielle Lamoure
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Represented By: Clinton Lee Coberly
Represented By: Bryan Scott Henry
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]