Melendez et al v. Cuskelly

Defendant: Donald F. Cuskelly
Plaintiff: Talla M. Melendez, Brooke Melendez and Diana Sweet
Case Number: 1:2013cv00492
Filed: February 25, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: William J. Martinez
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 12, 2013 15 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 13 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file proof of service on the newlynamed Defendants on or before May 13, 2013. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conferenc e set for April 22, 2013 at 9:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to July 2, 2013 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/12/2013.(ervsl, )
May 7, 2014 56 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/7/14 Granting Unopposed Motion to Amend the Final Pretrial Order to Add Greg Melendez and Robert Sweet as Nonexpert Witnesses Plaintiffs May Call 53 . The Final Pretrial Order [#51] is amended to add Greg Melendez and Robert Sweet as witnesses that Plaintiff may call. (lgale)
September 18, 2014 61 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/14. Motion to Amend Captions 59 is DENIED without prejudice. (lgale)
October 2, 2014 64 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 62 Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to AmendCaptions, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/2/2014.(evana, )
November 21, 2014 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 72 the Plaintiffs Unopposed Motion to Amend the Final Pretrial Order, filed November 20, 2014, by Judge William J. Martinez on 11/21/2014.(evana, )
February 28, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 4/22/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/28/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (ervsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Melendez et al v. Cuskelly
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald F. Cuskelly
Represented By: Aaron John Pratt
Represented By: Michael Brice Sullivan
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Talla M. Melendez
Represented By: Gerald Lynn Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brooke Melendez
Represented By: Gerald Lynn Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sweet
Represented By: Gerald Lynn Jorgensen
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]