Loflin v. Colvin

Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Plaintiff: Myrna A. Loflin
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00534
Filed: March 1, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Baca
Presiding Judge: John L. Kane
 
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWC)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 2, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN FOR SOCIAL SECURITY CASES (ORDER). SS Plaintiffs Brief due by 8/19/2013. SS Defendants Brief due by 9/18/2013. SS Plaintiffs Reply Brief due by 10/3/2013. By Judge John L. Kane on 7/2/13. (mnfsl, )
September 27, 2013 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 17 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Remand for Further Administrative Proceedings. This civil action is remanded to Defendant for additional administrative proceedings pursuant to sentence four of 42 U.S.C. § 405(g). The Clerk is directed to enter a judgment in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 58. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/27/13.(mnfsl, )
September 30, 2013 19 Opinion or Order of the Court FINAL JUDGMENT by Clerk, re: 18 Order. By Judge John L. Kane on 9/30/13. (mnfsl, )
January 8, 2014 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The document entitled 23 Stipulated Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act is approved. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $2,801.74. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/8/13.(mnfsl, )
January 8, 2014 25 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED 24 ORDER. The document entitled 23 Stipulated Fees Under the Equal Access to Justice Act is approved. Defendant pay to Plaintiff, through counsel, reasonable attorney fees and expenses in the amount of $2,801.74. By Judge John L. Kane on 1/8/14. (mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Loflin v. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn W. Colvin
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested_party: SSA Noticing
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Myrna A. Loflin
Represented By: Michael W. Seckar
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]