Haslett v. Security Fire Protection District

Plaintiff: Zachary Haslett
Defendant: Security Fire Protection District
Case Number: 1:2013cv00568
Filed: March 5, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: El Paso
Referring Judge: Boyd N. Boland
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 13, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 19 Recommendation is now made an order of the court. The 10 Motion to Certify Conditionally a Collective Action Under the Fair Labor Standards Act is granted, and the case is conditionally certified as a collectiveaction. A Schedulin g Conference and hearing on the issue of the notice to be sent to potential opt-in plaintiffs and the consent form is set for 6/24/2013 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland. The parties shall prepare a revised proposed scheduling order consistent with the requirements discussed in the 19 Recommendation at p. 4 and submit it to the court no later than 6/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/13/13.(mnfsl, )
June 27, 2013 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. The 31 Stipulation is accepted. The plaintiff is authorized to send the Notice and Consent Form to all potential opt-in plaintiffs. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/27/13. (mnfsl, )
September 3, 2013 38 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the filing of Defendant's 37 Notice of Withdrawal of Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Amend Complaint and Request to Vacate September 13, 2013 Hearing, the hearing set for 9/13/2013, at 1:30 PM, is vacated. Plaintiff's 35 Motion to Amend Complaint is granted and the Clerk of the Court is directed to accept the attached Amended Complaint for filing. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 9/3/13.(mnfsl, )
December 4, 2013 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 48 Joint Notice of Settlement and Motion to Stay Deadlines. All deadlines set for in the Court's 29 Scheduling Order are stayed. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/4/13.(mnfsl, )
December 16, 2013 52 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ENTRY for Motion Hearing held before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/16/2013. The Court GRANTS 49 Motion for Order. Dismissal Paper due by 12/20/2013. FTR: BNB Courtroom A-401. (lag)
December 16, 2013 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 49 Unopposed Motion to Approve Settlement of OvertimeClaim of Donald Chittenden. The parties shall file a motion or stipulation to dismiss with prejudice on or before 12/20/2013. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/16/2013. (klyon, )
December 19, 2013 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 54 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Approve Settlement of PLaintiff Zachary Haslett's Claims. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/19/2013.(klyon, )
December 30, 2013 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. The 58 Stipulation is granted and this case is hereby dismissed in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to pay his/its own costs and attorneys' fees. By Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 12/30/13. (mnfsl, )
March 20, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2013 02:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland, proposed Scheduling Order due by 5/28/13. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/20/13. (bnbcd, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haslett v. Security Fire Protection District
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Haslett
Represented By: Donna E. Dell'Olio
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Security Fire Protection District
Represented By: Meredith Lee McDonald
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]