Thornton v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.

Defendant: DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donald (I) Thornton and Donald Thornton
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00573
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download.
Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2013 14 Featured Case ORDER Granting 9 Motion to Consolidate Related Actions. Pursuant to Rule 42 (a), the related actions Nunez v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 1:13-cv-00574, Young v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 1:13-cv-00576, Moreno v. DaVita Hea lthcare Partners, Inc., No. 1:13-cv-00579 are consolidated and all future filings shall be made on this docket (Thornton v. Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 13-cv-00573-RBJ). The order referring case 13-cv-00576 to Magistrate Judge Craig B. Shaffer is VACATED. The Court will refer the consolidated cases to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya as she was the first magistrate judge to be assigned in these matters. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/10/13. (alvsl)
April 16, 2013 16 Featured Case ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2013 09:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/16/2013. (kmtcd)
April 23, 2013 23 Featured Case ORDER to Consolidate Related Action regarding Goosby v. Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 13-cv-00892-RBJ. The Court sua sponte orders that this case be consolidated with Thornton v. Davita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 13-cv-00573-RBJ-KMT and all future filings shall be made on case number 13-cv-00573-RBJ-KMT. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 04/23/13. (alvsl)
May 13, 2013 37 Featured Case Amended Order Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 7/24/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order by 7/17/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/13/13. (sgrim)
May 14, 2013 38 Featured Case Second Amended Order Setting Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference reset for 7/24/2013 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order on or before 7/17/13, by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/14/13. (sgrim)
March 7, 2013 4 Featured Case ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/07/2013. (rbjsec. )
June 24, 2013 50 Featured Case ORDER granting 46 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Pursuant to Rule 42(a), the related action Armstrong v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 1:13-cv-00893 is consolidated and all future filings shall be made on the consolidated docket under the caption: Thornton v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc., No. 13-cv-00573-RBJ-KMT. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 06/24/13. (alvsl)
October 8, 2013 67 Featured Case ORDER granting 61 Motion to Stay. Discovery is STAYED pending resolution of Defendants Motion to Dismiss. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days of ruling on Defendants Motion to Dismiss, if any portion of the case remains pending, to advise how they wish to proceed. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 10/8/213.(trlee, )
April 9, 2014 69 Featured Case ORDER granting in part 56 Motion to Dismiss. by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 4/9/14.(jdyne, )
May 29, 2014 76 Featured Case ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a 3 week jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to c ommence on October 19, 2015 at 9:00 a.m.A Trial Preparation Conference is set for September 25, 2015 at 1:30 p.m. In addition, the Court has set a two-day Hearing on Class Certification for October 22, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 05/29/2014. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Thornton v. DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DaVita Healthcare Partners, Inc.
Represented By: John Voorhees
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald (I) Thornton
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Thornton
Represented By: Steve W. Berman
Represented By: Robert Bruce Carey
Represented By: Leif Garrison
Represented By: Garth Daniel Wojtanowicz
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]