Houston v. Clements et al

Respondent: Willson and Tom Clements
Petitioner: Kyle Lee Houston
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00580
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Denver
Presiding Judge: Boyd N. Boland
 
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
March 7, 2013 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/07/2013. (skl)
March 20, 2013 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Directing Applicant to File Amended Pleading, by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 3/20/2013. (skl)
April 25, 2013 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER of Dismissal. ORDERED that the habeas corpus application 1 is denied and the action is dismissed without prejudice. No certificate of appealability will issue. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied without prejudice, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 4/25/13. (sgrim)
April 25, 2013 9 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT re: 8 Order of Dismissal, by Clerk on 4/25/13. (sgrim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: Houston v. Clements et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Willson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Tom Clements
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kyle Lee Houston
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]