McKnight v. Goodall et al

Plaintiff: Craig A McKnight
Defendant: Martin Goodall and Helen Goodall
 
Case Number: 1:2013cv00581
Filed: March 6, 2013
 
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: R. Brooke Jackson
 
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed#Document Text
July 29, 2013 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND TRIAL PREPARATION CONFERENCE: This matter has been scheduled for a three day jury trial on the docket of Judge R. Brooke Jackson in the U.S. District Courthouse, Courtroom A902, 9th Floor, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado, to commence on April 21, 2014 at 9:00 a.m. A Trial Preparation Conference is set for April 4, 2014 at 1:00 p.m. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 07/29/2013. (rbjsec. )
February 18, 2014 19 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 2/18/14. (rbjcd, )
March 8, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SET SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: The parties are ordered to set an initial scheduling conference in this Court (with Judge Jackson) pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.1 no later than 45 days after the answer, motion to dismiss or other response to the complaint is filed. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 03/08/2013. (rbjsec. )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.
Search for this case: McKnight v. Goodall et al
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig A McKnight
Represented By: William Dan Mahoney
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martin Goodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen Goodall
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]