Richardson v. Stock et al

Defendant: Giles, Oliverius, Hill, Limbreis, Jo Ann Stock and Bev Dowis
Plaintiff: John Richardson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00606
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Logan
Presiding Judge: Marcia S. Krieger
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 16, 2013 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/16/2013. (kmtcd)
December 19, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 38 Motion for Leave to Depose Incarcerated Plaintiff. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 12/19/2013.(trlee, )
March 14, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Drawing Case by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 03/14/13. This case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. (nmmsl, )
January 13, 2015 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER adopting and modifying 48 Report and Recommendations. Granting 13 motion for summary judgment and directs the Clerk of the Court to enter JUDGMENT in Defendant Stock's favor and against Plaintiff. GRANTS, in part, Defendant Dowis� 39; motion to dismiss 19 and DENIES, in part, Defendant Dowis' motion to dismiss. GRANTS, in part, Officer Defendants' motion to dismiss 32 and DENIES, in part, Officer Defendants' motion to dismiss as outlined in the attached order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/13/2015.(tscha, )
January 23, 2015 90 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying as moot 68 Motion for Summary Judgment and granting 89 Motion to Dismiss. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 1/23/2015.(tscha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Richardson v. Stock et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Giles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oliverius
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Limbreis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jo Ann Stock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bev Dowis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Richardson
Represented By: Cheryl Louise Trine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets were retrieved from PACER, and should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.