Simakis et al v. Peterson

Plaintiff: Sam Simakis and Karen Frame
Defendant: David Peterson
Case Number: 1:2013cv00608
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Boulder
Presiding Judge: Philip A. Brimmer
Referring Judge: Kristen L. Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 22, 2013 13 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference; Scheduling Conference set for 5/20/2013 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/22/2013. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment 1, # 2 Attachment 2, # 3 Attachment 3) (klmcd, )
September 18, 2013 20 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 18 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Concerning Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Deadline, Discovery Deadline, and Dispositive Motions Deadline. Discovery due by 12/19/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 1/18/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/18/13.(mnfsl, )
October 8, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 21 Stipulated Motion for Protective Order. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2013.(klyon, )
October 8, 2013 24 Opinion or Order of the Court PROTECTIVE ORDER. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/8/2013. (klyon, )
November 8, 2013 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 25 Second Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Concerning Rebuttal Deadline. Discovery due by 1/19/2014. Dispositive Motions due by 2/18/2014. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/13.(mnfsl, )
December 9, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 28 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Concerning Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Related to Plaintiffs'Adoption Related Damages. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/9/13.(mnfsl, )
January 8, 2014 36 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER granting 34 Second Unopposed Motion to Amend Scheduling Order Concerning Rebuttal Expert Disclosure Related to Plaintiffs' Adoption Related Damages. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/8/14.(mnfsl, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simakis et al v. Peterson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sam Simakis
Represented By: Michael John Thomson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Frame
Represented By: Michael John Thomson
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Peterson
Represented By: James E. Goldfarb
Represented By: David James Goldfarb
Search Blogs [ Justia BlawgSearch | Google Blogsearch ]
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]